Accounts and annual returns TWINKLE TRUST ANIMAL AID

Charity number: 1091253
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2020 10 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 10 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2019 30 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 30 August 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2018 29 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 29 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2017 15 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

15 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2016 29 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

29 August 2017 On time Download Open in new window