Financial history TWINKLE TRUST ANIMAL AID

Charity number: 1091253
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020
Total gross income £61.69k £42.58k £54.44k £44.37k £55.00k
Total expenditure £60.32k £41.56k £52.44k £42.54k £54.00k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A