Financial history THE WILDLIFE TRUST OF SOUTH AND WEST WALES LIMITED

Charity number: 1091562
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.87m £1.89m £2.71m £2.41m £2.71m
Total expenditure £1.81m £1.93m £2.02m £2.44m £2.00m
Income from government contracts £77.44k £83.59k N/A N/A £27.69k
Income from government grants £21.31k £19.67k £43.70k £451.22k £748.05k
Income - Donations and legacies £512.86k £464.10k £1.47m £605.78k £581.67k
Income - Other trading activities £855.50k £934.12k £694.51k £721.31k £247.06k
Income - Charitable activities £426.16k £420.81k £586.55k £952.48k £1.80m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £135.83k £0 £0
Income - Investment £59.72k £55.84k £75.94k £82.38k £57.95k
Income - Other £18.05k £15.39k £22.03k £48.72k £23.39k
Income - Legacies £129.82k £21.20k £96.10k £40.14k £63.06k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £953.57k £986.47k £1.13m £1.53m £1.51m
Expenditure - Raising funds £225.47k £298.52k £217.63k £242.31k £161.49k
Expenditure - Governance £7.03k £6.93k £6.30k £7.58k £8.67k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £629.28k £645.11k £666.89k £677.24k £329.42k