Financial history SEVERN VALLEY RAILWAY CHARITABLE TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1092723
Charity reporting is overdue by 46 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £982.26k £1.65m £1.42m £1.49m £836.31k
Total expenditure £594.11k £835.42k £2.27m £846.36k £1.38m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £2.94k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £851.64k £1.46m £1.33m £1.44m £828.89k
Income - Other trading activities £103.81k £154.22k £10.79k £3.74k £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £40.98k £20.42k £0
Income - Endowments £11.39k £0 £0 £0 £20.00k
Income - Investment £26.82k £33.98k £37.21k £26.39k £27.42k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £371.66k £953.15k £469.49k £516.36k £178.42k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £382.58k £695.99k £2.14m £690.17k £1.22m
Expenditure - Raising funds £211.52k £139.43k £126.61k £156.19k £156.16k
Expenditure - Governance £1.86k £5.50k £6.90k £6.93k £1.77k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £10.88k £11.59k £9.89k £11.23k £8.08k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0