Accounts and annual returns LONDON COMMUNITY COLLEGE

Charity number: 1093358
Charity reporting is up to date (30 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2021 30 September 2022 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 30 September 2022 30 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2020 31 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 31 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 07 October 2020 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 07 October 2020 37 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2018 24 December 2019 115 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 24 December 2019 115 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2017 25 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 04 September 2018 4 days late Download Open in new window