Financial history HORSLEY CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1092436
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £17.52k £20.41k £18.61k £18.05k £4.45k
Total expenditure £16.48k £19.80k £20.48k £17.36k £4.59k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A