Financial history VICTORIA PARK HARRIERS AND TOWER HAMLETS AC

Charity number: 1091712
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £73.91k £64.69k £84.64k £64.72k £102.51k
Total expenditure £110.67k £48.77k £118.13k £82.05k £117.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A