Financial history HARINGEY SOMALI COMMUNITY AND CULTURAL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1090709
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £84.72k £89.47k £66.19k £107.18k £62.32k
Total expenditure £80.95k £77.28k £65.58k £72.47k £73.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £52.53k N/A £45.31k
Income from government grants £70.95k £70.95k N/A £103.00k N/A