THE EMTHONJENI TRUST

Charity number: 1092880
Charity reporting is up to date (57 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 27 July 2020 57 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 29 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 29 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 31 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 08 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2015 08 May 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2015 Not Required