BRISTOL SOUTH DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 1091301
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 19 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 27 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 28 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 16 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

16 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 24 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required