BRISTOL SOUTH DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 1091301
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £15.58k £54.99k £128.08k £111.89k £96.39k
Total expenditure £11.51k £60.48k £58.18k £129.75k £93.69k