BRISTOL SOUTH DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 1091301
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
James Wall Trustee 17 January 2020 None on record
Gary Turner Trustee 05 June 2015 None on record
TONY REES Trustee 04 July 2013 None on record
Cathy Harding Trustee 06 June 2014 None on record
Theresa Coll Trustee 10 November 2019 None on record
Nick Winter Trustee None on record
Gemma Francis Trustee 17 January 2020 None on record
Scott Stowell Trustee 06 June 2014 None on record
Beth Haines Trustee 12 July 2019 None on record
Andy Morris Trustee 04 December 2016 None on record
STEPHEN JAMES THOMAS Trustee 29 December 2011
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER'S BISHOPSWORTH Received: On time
ST PETER'S BISHOPSWORTH CHARITY Received: On time
Steve Williams Chair 02 July 2019
82ND BRISTOL (ST BERNADETTE) SCOUT GROUP Received: On time