Trustees SEASHELL TRUST
Charity number: 1092655
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanna Munnelly | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Colin Hoggins | Trustee | 07 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel McMillan | Trustee | 07 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kai Uus | Trustee | 07 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lynn Perry | Trustee | 19 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Neil Andrew Masom | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tina Wilkins | Trustee | 06 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carol Povey | Trustee | 15 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Martin Heath | Trustee | 15 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER LUKE SMALE | Trustee | 30 January 2017 |
|
|||||
STEPHEN GILLINGHAM | Trustee | 14 November 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.