KARIC FOUNDATION LONDON

Charity number: 1099172
Charity reporting is overdue by 595 days
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2014 05/04/2015 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £0