Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF ST LEVAN

Charity number: 1091783
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 January 2021 11 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2020 17 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2019 14 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2018 13 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2017 07 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2017 Not Required