Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ST LEVAN

Charity number: 1091783
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/01/2017 01/01/2018 01/01/2019 01/01/2020 01/01/2021
Total gross income £2.43k £1.78k £2.53k £2.41k £1.92k
Total expenditure £3.28k £2.07k £112 £4.96k £20
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A