WHAPLODE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1094800
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 15 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 03 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 17 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required