WHAPLODE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1094800
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £11.22k £8.87k £8.59k £7.14k £20.33k
Total expenditure £8.17k £5.80k £5.23k £5.29k £4.22k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £19.67k