Financial history THE CHILDREN'S INVESTMENT FUND FOUNDATION (UK)

Charity number: 1091043
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £600.29m £54.29m £80.87m £13.65m £17.86m
Total expenditure £244.15m £210.40m £305.97m £298.64m £618.74m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £205.64k
Income - Donations and legacies £680.18k £7.50m £2.95m £61.76m £3.13m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £28.64m £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £190.42m £54.29m £80.87m £13.65m £17.86m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £191.86m £185.27m £228.26m £287.99m £604.63m
Expenditure - Raising funds £52.30m £25.13m £77.72m £10.65m £14.11m
Expenditure - Governance £3.97m £4.60m £1.54m £1.98m £3.24m
Expenditure - Grants institution £170.15m £0 £0 £286.01m £601.38m
Expenditure - Investment management £47.62m £25.13m £77.72m £10.65m £14.11m
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0