Accounts and annual returns THE WYCOMBE ENVIRONMENT CENTRE LTD

Charity number: 1094917
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 24 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 16 May 2021 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 04 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 01 April 2019 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 25 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required