THE NATURAL DEATH CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Natural Death Centre is a social entrepreneurial, educational charity which sees death as a natural part of life. It is committed to supporting cultural change and is working towards a situation where all people are empowered in the process of dying, and organising a funeral. We also run the Association of Natural Burial Grounds, a body set up to promote green burials.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 26 March 2002: Standard registration
- THE NICHOLAS ALBERY FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tracy O'Leary | Trustee | 18 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD PHILIP PUTT | Trustee | 29 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN MORRIS Mrs. | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.42k | £50.87k | £40.97k | £41.14k | £44.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.74k | £54.34k | £42.91k | £43.12k | £42.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 March 2025 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 March 2025 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 June 2023 | 141 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 June 2023 | 141 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 February 2022 | 379 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 FEBRUARY 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 27 FEBRUARY 2007.
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, OF STUDIES IN POLITICAL, ECONOMIC, SOCIAL AND ENVIRONMENTAL SCIENCE AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL SUBJECTS AND THE PROMOTION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, OF EDUCATION AND DISSEMINATION OF KNOWLEDGE, IN SUCH SCIENCES AND SUBJECTS WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO: 1. WORK, EDUCATION AND CULTURE IN RELATION TO RURAL AND INDUSTRIAL LIFE; 2. THE BETTER USE OF RESOURCES, ESPECIALLY NON-RENEWABLE RESOURCES AND THE PRODUCTION AND CONSERVATION OF GOODS AND ENERGY; 3. AGRICULTURE, HORTICULTURE AND SILVICULTURE; 4. ECOLOGY AND THE ENVIRONMENT; 5. MICROECONOMICS WITH SPECIAL REFERENCE TO THE OPTIMUM SIZE OF COMMUNITIES, INDUSTRIES, BUSINESSES AND AGRICULTURAL HOLDINGS AND THE ROLE AND POTENTIAL OF THE SAME ; 6. THE USE OF LOW-TECHNOLOGY SKILLS AND CRAFTS AND TO PUBLISH THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH; 7. THE PROBLEMS OF MINORITY GROUPS OF ENGLAND AND ELSEWHERE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE NATURAL DEATH CENTRE
In the Hill House
Watley Lane
Twyford
WINCHESTER
SO21 1QX
- Phone:
- 07914208993
- Email:
- susan@naturaldeath.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window