BOSNIA AND HERZEGOVINA CLUB LJILJAN NORTH EAST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The club organise social events, cultural and sport activities, take part in consultation events, capacity building sessions and provide advice to its members.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 14 May 2002: Standard registration
- 03 April 2023: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 03 April 2023: Funds transferred to 1191203 BOSNIAN GENOCIDE EDUCATIONAL TRUST
- BOSNIA AND HERZEGOVINA CLUB (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 29 June 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 JANUARY 1997 15 JUNE 2001
Charitable objects
I) TO PROVIDE RELIEF FOR ALL PERSON FROM BOSNIA AND HERZEGOVINA RESIDING IN THE NORTH EAST OF ENGLAND AND THEIR DEPENDANTS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS II) TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUCH REFUGEES AND DEPENDANTS III) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THE REFUGEES AND THEIR DEPENDANTS IN NEED THEREBY ENABLING THEM TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND ASSIST IN THEIR REHABILITATION WITHIN THEIR ADOPTED COUNTRY OF RESIDENCE
Area of benefit
NORTH EAST ENGLAND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window