Accounts and annual returns EXETER CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Charity number: 1091143
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 21 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 11 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 28 August 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 03 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 03 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 03 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 26 June 2017 On time Download Open in new window