Financial history EXETER CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Charity number: 1091143
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £505.38k £508.81k £460.99k £508.91k £719.14k
Total expenditure £532.10k £499.88k £477.43k £533.50k £637.69k
Income from government contracts £73.00k £69.60k N/A £100.00k £200.00k
Income from government grants £133.33k £112.63k £124.13k £42.40k £31.50k
Income - Donations and legacies £189.77k £205.09k N/A £159.21k £358.31k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £313.52k £302.16k N/A £347.83k £359.21k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.08k £1.56k N/A £1.87k £1.63k
Income - Other £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £532.10k £499.88k N/A £533.50k £637.69k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £3.61k £0 N/A £2.64k £2.82k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 N/A £0 £59.61k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A £0 £0