DOLLIS HILL HOUSE TRUST

Charity number: 1092894
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 November 2021 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 November 2020 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 15 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 14 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 04 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required