DOLLIS HILL HOUSE TRUST

Charity number: 1092894
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £2.50k £0 £127 £6.12k £0
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A