Financial history CHOSEN PEOPLE MINISTRIES (UK)

Charity number: 1095644
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £256.17k £436.26k £288.36k £281.14k £349.63k
Total expenditure £258.43k £304.36k £285.52k £282.24k £288.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A