GLOUCESTERSHIRE CHINESE WOMEN'S GUILD

Charity number: 1091416
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 04 September 2020 217 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 04 September 2020 217 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 31 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 31 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 31 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 January 2017 On time Download