GLOUCESTERSHIRE CHINESE WOMEN'S GUILD

Charity number: 1091416
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £36.96k £37.26k £31.17k £36.32k £31.79k
Total expenditure £41.57k £44.36k £51.07k £51.15k £69.27k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £19.64k £21.54k N/A £19.86k £19.64k