Financial history THE JUST A DROP APPEAL

Charity number: 1100505
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £819.92k £778.94k £797.61k £544.63k £686.53k
Total expenditure £761.65k £798.07k £715.12k £597.82k £670.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £6.09k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £727.70k £778.89k £797.56k £544.62k £686.50k
Income - Other trading activities £92.20k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £14 £52 £58 £3 £33
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £25.00k £0 £0 £3.57k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £595.13k £603.07k £570.24k £472.48k £504.61k
Expenditure - Raising funds £166.52k £195.00k £144.88k £125.35k £165.65k
Expenditure - Governance £10.04k £8.64k £8.52k £6.47k £3.94k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £413.85k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0