FRIENDS OF ABBEY MEADS SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1092756
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provide funding for Abbey Meads school activities such as school educational trips, sports equipment and playground equipment etc.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £10,417
Total expenditure: £9,517

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Wiltshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 July 2002: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FOAMS (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kim Jones Chair 11 November 2019
None on record
Lucy Victoria Carson Trustee 14 November 2021
None on record
Nicola Newman Trustee 11 November 2019
None on record
Danielle Spencer Trustee 11 November 2019
None on record
Amie Pratt Trustee 11 November 2019
None on record
Claire Hucklebury-Brown Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record
LOUISE TURNER Trustee 20 April 2012
None on record
NICHOLAS BADGER Trustee 28 May 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £9.84k £8.44k £15.94k £12.91k £10.42k
Total expenditure £12.86k £6.57k £11.95k £12.66k £9.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 02 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 03 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 19 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 07 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 25 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
67 THRESHER DRIVE
SWINDON
SN25 4AE
Phone:
01793706379