Financial history HOLY REDEEMER ST MARK MISSION LIMITED

Charity number: 1094659
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £5.53k £5.93k £6.44k £5.87k £6.32k
Total expenditure £4.13k £6.34k £4.67k £8.33k £4.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A