CITY GATE COMMUNITY PROJECTS

Charity number: 1093245
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gwyn Davies Trustee 25 September 2017
CITY GATE CHURCH, UK Received: On time
Steven Hardman Trustee 01 September 2018 None on record
Keith Harrison Trustee 01 September 2018 None on record
Fiona Kaye Bennett Trustee 14 May 2021 None on record
Elizabeth Jane Brewer Trustee 12 May 2020 None on record
James Peter Marchant Trustee 12 May 2020 None on record
Caroline Ward Trustee 01 September 2018 None on record
Yvonne Au Trustee 25 September 2017
CITY GATE CHURCH, UK Received: On time
Katharine Bingley Trustee 12 May 2020 None on record
JONATHAN WILKINS Trustee 11 October 2016
CITY GATE CHURCH, UK Received: On time