THE VINE TRUST WALSALL

Charity number: 1093838
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £2.44m £2.59m £24.92m £768.37k £584.84k
Total expenditure £2.66m £2.78m £1.83m £563.19k £280.35k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.73m £0 £23.92m N/A £63.70k
Income - Donations and legacies £58.81k £139.60k £266.36k £85.04k £157.54k
Income - Other trading activities £288.21k £301.13k £397.89k £266.48k £70.67k
Income - Charitable activities £371.39k £2.15m £271.37k £106.66k £56.61k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £1.73m £0 £23.98m £310.19k £300.02k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.60m £2.73m £918.81k £563.19k £280.35k
Expenditure - Raising funds £4.67k £10.74k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £60.99k £0 £24.87k £20.65k £7.56k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £60.99k £46.02k £911.01k £0 £0