Accounts and annual returns MRS ELDA CARAPIET'S 1961 SETTLEMENT

Charity number: 1096866
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 April 2021 20 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 April 2020 09 March 2021 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 29 April 2019 25 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 April 2019 25 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 April 2018 24 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 April 2018 24 August 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 April 2017 16 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 April 2017 16 September 2017 On time Download Open in new window