Financial history MRS ELDA CARAPIET'S 1961 SETTLEMENT

Charity number: 1096866
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/04/2017 29/04/2018 29/04/2019 29/04/2020 29/04/2021
Total gross income £35.94k £28.35k £29.18k £24.94k £16.09k
Total expenditure £32.60k £33.83k £30.71k £14.43k £22.73k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A