The Veteran Equine Trust Limited

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise public awareness of elderly horses. Dedicated to the care & welfare of elderly horses.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 June 2004: Standard registration
- Veteran Equine Trust (Working name)
- THE VETERAN HORSE WELFARE SOCIETY LIMITED (Previous name)
- VETERAN HORSE WELFARE (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JULIANNE ASTON | Chair | 12 March 2004 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Dawkins | Trustee | 10 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Robert Aston | Trustee | 10 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.84k | £39.09k | £11.64k | £4.34k | £8.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.81k | £25.52k | £8.26k | £4.19k | £5.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.25k | £4.14k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 APRIL 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 25 APRIL 2004. as amended on 12 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF VETERAN HORSES IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH HORSES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5-6 Priory Street
Cardigan
CARDIGAN
SA43 1BX
- Phone:
- 07789514004
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window