PLANNING AID TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust was formed to generate funds to support Planning Aid, a vital scheme to enable access to the planning system for those who might otherwise be excluded. Planning Aid is partially funded by Communities and Local Government by grant to the Royal Town Planning Institute. Other funding is required to supplement this grant and to continue expanding.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 May 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Patrick | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON THE 26TH JULY 2001.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE TRUST IS TO ADVANCE THE SCIENCE AND ART OF TOWN AND COUNTRY PLANNING AND TO FURTHER HIGH STANDARDS OF TOWN AND COUNTRY PLANNING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BY:- A. INFORMING MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC HOW THE TOWN AND COUNTRY PLANNING SYSTEM WORKS AND IN PARTICULAR HOW DEVELOPMENT PLANS ARE PREPARED AND HOW PLANNING APPLICATIONS AND APPEALS ARE MADE; B. PROVIDING FOR INDIVIDUALS AND COMMUNITY GROUPS WHO ARE UNABLE TO AFFORD A PLANNING CONSULTANT FREE AND PROFESSIONAL ADVICE INDEPENDENT OF LOCAL AUTHORITIES ON PARTICULAR TOWN AND COUNTRY PLANNING PROBLEMS, ISSUES OR DECISIONS; C. EXPLAINING TO INDIVIDUALS AND LOCAL GROUPS THE TECHNICAL, ADMINISTRATIVE AND LEGAL MATTERS ASSOCIATED WITH PLANNING AND ENVIRONMENTAL PROBLEMS, ISSUES OR DECISIONS AND ASSISTING INDIVIDUALS OR LOCAL GROUPS TO PARTICIPATE CONSTRUCTIVELY IN THE PLANNING PROCESS; D. HELPING INDIVIDUALS AND LOCAL GROUPS TO GAIN THE KNOWLEDGE TO PURSUE EFFECTIVELY THEIR OWN PARTICIPATION IN TOWN AND COUNTRY PLANNING AND RELATED ISSUES; E. UNDERSTANDING AND PROMOTING RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT INTO TOWN AND COUNTRY PLANNING AND ITS SOCIAL, ECONOMIC AND ENVIRONMENTAL EFFECTS THE COMMUNITY AND INTO OTHER RELEVANT FIELDS OF STUDY IN CONNECTION WITH TOWN AND COUNTRY PLANNING (INCLUDING THE PUBLICATION OF THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH).
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE ROYAL TOWN PLANNING INSTITUTE
41-42 BOTOLPH LANE
LONDON
EC3R 8DL
- Phone:
- 02079299494
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window