Accounts and annual returns FILTON COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity number: 1093551
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 29 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 29 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 04 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 04 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2019 24 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 24 February 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2018 24 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 24 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2017 23 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 26 February 2018 On time Download Open in new window