Accounts and annual returns COMMUNITY YOUTH PROJECT

Charity number: 1093293
Charity reporting is up to date (56 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 March 2022 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 28 March 2022 56 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 10 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 01 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 01 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 08 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 08 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 16 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 16 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window