Financial history CHRIST THE ROCK MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1101041
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £58.61k £60.62k £60.27k £81.84k £70.10k
Total expenditure £52.31k £48.94k £37.96k £39.65k £43.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A