SOMERSET FILM AND VIDEO LTD

Charity number: 1095587
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Digital and media film development agency: community media centre; open to public three days per week for facilities, equipment and tuition; offering a wide range of film and digital media services to the public either free of charge or at affordable rates; running training courses; working with hard to reach groups; working with local schools and colleges and community groups

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Bath And North East Somerset
  • Devon
  • Dorset
  • Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 January 2003: Standard registration
  • 17 June 2020: Funds received from 1061119 THEATRE MELANGE
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Abigail Watts Trustee 26 March 2025
None on record
Jack Martin Trustee 26 February 2025
None on record
Lisa Walters Trustee 27 January 2025
None on record
Grace Mary Morgan Trustee 23 January 2025
None on record
Sophie Louise Brown Trustee 22 January 2025
None on record
Craig Alan Luck Trustee 12 March 2024
None on record
JAMES GODMAN Trustee 12 March 2024
THE ROYAL AIR FORCES ASSOCIATION - FROME BRANCH
Received: On time
Richard James Crowe Trustee 27 February 2024
SEED SEDGEMOOR
Received: On time
Robert Charles Franklin Trustee 26 February 2024
None on record
Dylan Paul Martlew Trustee 29 December 2023
None on record
David Terry Pearce Trustee 18 April 2023
None on record
Pauline Annette Burr Trustee 05 February 2019
SEED SEDGEMOOR
Received: On time
SUSAN MARY ISHERWOOD Trustee
THE WELLS MUSEUM
Recently registered
WESTBURY VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £247.97k £451.79k £744.80k £447.51k £560.60k
Total expenditure £254.21k £387.77k £683.34k £300.10k £274.03k
Income from government contracts £4.80k N/A N/A £22.35k £5.87k
Income from government grants £42.49k £46.80k £107.46k £193.93k £15.57k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £714.06k N/A £503.30k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £26.80k N/A £22.23k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £3.90k N/A £33.01k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £713.07k N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £42 N/A £2.05k
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £989 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £662.51k N/A £255.13k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £20.83k N/A £18.90k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £51.89k N/A £42.11k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £3.96k N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets N/A N/A £75.59k N/A £765.41k
Long-term investments N/A N/A £328.59k N/A £0
Other assets N/A N/A £148.64k N/A £193.26k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Total liabilities N/A N/A £53.61k N/A £25.46k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 06 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 06 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 23 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 23 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 16 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 06 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 11 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE ENGINE ROOM
50-52 HIGH STREET
BRIDGWATER
TA6 3BL
Phone:
01278433187