OLLERTON AND DISTRICT ECONOMIC FORUM
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Urban and rural regeneration in areas of social and economic deprivation
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2016
Mae cyfanswm yr incwm yn cynnwys £13,950 o grant(iau) llywodraeth
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Gweithredu Fel Corff Mantell Neu Gorff Adnoddau
- Swydd Nottingham
Llywodraethu
- 12 Mehefin 2002: Cofrestrwyd
- 04 Ebrill 2019: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
- ODEF (Enw gwaith)
- Trin cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Talu staff
- Rheoli risg
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £193.99k | £239.30k | £135.25k | £212.81k | £228.87k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £200.69k | £234.70k | £162.26k | £206.19k | £218.47k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £13.95k |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2019 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2019 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2018 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2018 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2017 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2017 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2016 | 06 Ionawr 2017 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2016 | 06 Ionawr 2017 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 9 JANUARY 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 16 MAY 2002 AND 3 JULY 2003
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE COMPANY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE TO PROMOTE, FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT, URBAN AND RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT; B) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT; C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING , PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE; D)THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL , OR BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSULTANCY, EITHER DIRECTLY OR BY REFERRAL TO APPROPRIATE AGENCIES, IN ORDER TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE IN CASES OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED THROUGH HELP (A) IN SETTING UP THEIR OWN BUSINESS, OR (B) TO EXISTING BUSINESSES; E) THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY ENCOURAGING INWARD INVESTMENT, DIVERSIFICATION AND IMPROVED INFRASTRUCTURE; F) THE PROMOTION OF RECREATIONAL OPPORTUNITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE AND/OR THOSE WHO, BY REASONS OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES; G) THE PROTECTION OR CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT; H) THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND PREVENTION OF CRIME; AND I) SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY, FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND AND WALES WITHIN THE AREA DEFINED AS OLLERTON AND DISTRICT. THIS COMPRISES OLLERTON AND THOSE SURROUNDING VILLAGE THAT USE OLLERTON AS A SERVICE CENTRE.
Maes buddion
OLLERTON AND DISTRICT, THIS COMPRISES OLLERTONN AND THOSE SURROUNDING VILLAGES THAT USE OLLERTON AS A SERVICE CENTRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window