Accounts and annual returns LINCOLN COLLEGE VACATION PROJECT

Charity number: 1092434
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 05 March 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 04 December 2022 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 November 2021 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 09 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 26 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required