LINCOLN COLLEGE VACATION PROJECT

Charity number: 1092434
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £29.33k £26.14k £25.00k £17.40k £39.28k
Total expenditure £23.17k £19.74k £24.82k £39.06k £21.71k