Accounts and annual returns SOUTH AND SOUTH EAST IN BLOOM

Charity number: 1092421
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 22 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 14 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 14 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2018 29 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 29 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2017 26 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

26 March 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2016 16 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

16 February 2017 On time Download Open in new window