ALTRINCHAM ELECTRIC RAILWAY PRESERVATION SOCIETY

Charity number: 1093098
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £2.76k £6.46k £4.45k £2.75k £2.85k
Total expenditure £6.45k £9.85k £6.08k £13.24k £12.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A