LEEDS ASYLUM SEEKERS SUPPORT NETWORK

Charity number: 1092647
Charity reporting is up to date (9 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £150.17k £162.14k £235.50k £309.15k £273.10k
Total expenditure £133.53k £141.57k £219.98k £250.21k £283.59k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A £52.57k
Income from government grants £0 £0 £37.73k £69.81k N/A