Accounts and annual returns WASHINGTON ASYLUM SEEKERS PROJECT
Charity number: 1093416
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 September 2008 | 09 June 2009 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2008 | 09 June 2009 | On time | |
Annual return | 01 September 2007 | 01 May 2008 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2007 | 22 February 2008 | On time | |
Annual return | 01 September 2006 | 30 May 2007 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2006 | 21 February 2007 | On time | |
Annual return | 01 September 2005 | 29 June 2006 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2005 | 31 May 2006 | On time | |
Annual return | 01 September 2004 | 10 June 2005 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2004 | 10 June 2005 | On time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window