Accounts and annual returns YARLSIDE PTA

Charity number: 1092614
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 24 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 18 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 24 July 2020 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 23 September 2019 115 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 17 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required